Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Alphonsus Tchao (Zhao, Chao Chen-ya), C.M. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Tianjin [Tientsin], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1904Born
2 Jul 193026.4EnteredMember of Congregation of the Mission
16 Feb 193127.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
13 Feb 195349.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Tianjin [Tientsin], China
1981¹76.9ResignedApostolic Administrator of Tianjin [Tientsin], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alphonsus Tchao (Zhao, Chao Chen-ya)
Father Alphonsus Tchao (Zhao, Chao Chen-ya) C.M. (born ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Tianjin [Tientsin]

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast