Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Changde [Changteh]

Dioecesis Ciamteanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Changsha [Changsha]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 10,000 (3,862 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, Changde, Hunan, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Hunan {Hu-Nan Settentrionale}
19 September 1879ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Hunan {Hu-Nan} Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Hunan {Hu-Nan Settentrionale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Changteh [Changde]
3 December 1924ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Northern Hunan {Hu-Nan Settentrionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Changteh [Changde]
Diocese of Changde [Changteh]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Changteh [Changde] Diocese of Changde [Changteh]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Changde [Changteh]
19506,6903,200,000.2%4812557546ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 1 Jul 2013