Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinz Wilhelm Steckling, O.M.I.

Bishop of Ciudad del Este, Paraguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1947 Born
1 May 196720.0ProfessedMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
15 Apr 197325.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
15 Apr 197325.9Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
20 Jul 197427.2Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
Sep 1998³51.3AppointedSuperior General of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
29 Sep 201063.4ResignedSuperior General of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
15 Nov 201467.5AppointedBishop of Ciudad del Este, Paraguay
21 Dec 201467.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad del Este, Paraguay

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Heinz Wilhelm Steckling
Bishop Heinz Wilhelm Steckling O.M.I. (born ) Bishop of Ciudad del Este

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWerl, Germany

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ciudad del Este.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Nov 2014
  • od/ob/c01: CB, 15 Nov 2014
  • c34: CB, 27 Nov 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,333

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Feb 2017