Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludwig Maria Hugo

Deceased

Bishop of Mainz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1871BornArzheim
28 Oct 189423.8Ordained PriestPriest of Speyer, Germany
7 Mar 192150.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Mainz, Germany
7 Mar 192150.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Bubastis
10 Apr 192150.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bubastis
15 Apr 192150.2SucceededBishop of Mainz, Germany
27 Apr 192150.3InstalledBishop of Mainz, Germany
30 Mar 193564.2DiedBishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ludwig Maria Hugo:
Bishop Ludwig Maria Hugo (born , died ) Bishop of Mainz

  • a priest for 40.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 20
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 94

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013