Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ulrich Neymeyr

Bishop of Erfurt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1957 BornWorms-Herrnsheim
12 Jun 198224.8Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
20 Feb 200345.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
20 Feb 200345.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Maraguia
21 Apr 200345.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maraguia
19 Sep 201457.1AppointedBishop of Erfurt, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ulrich Neymeyr:
Bishop Ulrich Neymeyr (born ) Bishop of Erfurt

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Erfurt.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 171, Number 14,365
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Sep 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 19 Sep 2014