Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carl Joseph Leiprecht

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rottenburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1903Born
24 Mar 192824.5Ordained PriestPriest of Rottenburg, Germany
7 Oct 194845.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rottenburg, Germany
7 Oct 194845.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Scyrus
30 Nov 194845.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Scyrus
21 Jun 194945.7SelectedBishop of Rottenburg, Germany
4 Jul 194945.8ConfirmedBishop of Rottenburg, Germany
8 Sep 194945.9InstalledBishop of Rottenburg, Germany
4 Jun 197470.7ResignedBishop of Rottenburg, Germany
28 Oct 198178.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Rottenburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Carl Joseph Leiprecht (VIAF: 3233716)
Bishop Carl Joseph Leiprecht (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rottenburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHauerz

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 32.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 128

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast