Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bonaventure Bauyn

Deceased

Bishop of Uzés, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1699Born
22 May 172828.4Ordained PriestPriest
8 Sep 173636.7SelectedBishop of Uzés, France
11 Feb 173737.2ConfirmedBishop of Uzés, France
24 Mar 173737.3Ordained BishopBishop of Uzés, France
16 Oct 177979.8DiedBishop of Uzés, France

MicroData Summary for Bonaventure Bauyn
Bishop Bonaventure Bauyn (born , died ) Bishop of Uzés

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDijon

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 42.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 428
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,737, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast