Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin du Bellay

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fréjus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1703BornClereau
172723.7Ordained PriestPriest
16 Nov 173936.5AppointedBishop of Fréjus, France
13 Dec 173936.6Ordained BishopBishop of Fréjus, France
4 Aug 176663.2ResignedBishop of Fréjus, France
19 Dec 177572.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Fréjus, France

MicroData Summary for Martin du Bellay:
Bishop Martin du Bellay (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fréjus

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 36.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 218

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013