Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph de Maurel du Chaffaut

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1658BornAix
31 Mar 171455.4AppointedBishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France
9 Jul 171455.7ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France
26 Aug 171455.8Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France
10 Mar 171758.3DiedBishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph de Maurel du Chaffaut:
Bishop Joseph de Maurel du Chaffaut (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux

  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 389
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 6 Jul 2015