Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Aube de Roquemartine

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1630BornArles
7 Mar 165524.2Ordained PriestPriest
16 Sep 167544.8SelectedBishop of Grasse, France
16 Nov 167645.9ConfirmedBishop of Grasse, France
17 Jan 167746.1Ordained BishopBishop of Grasse, France
21 Mar 168150.3SelectedBishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France
25 May 168251.5ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France
19 Sep 171382.8DiedBishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France

MicroData Summary for Louis Aube de Roquemartine:
Bishop Louis Aube de Roquemartine (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux

  • a priest for 58.5 years
  • a bishop for 36.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 211, and Page 389

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013