Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Verjus

Deceased

Bishop of Grasse


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1633BornSenonen
31 May 168451.4SelectedBishop of Grasse, France
24 Mar 169259.2ConfirmedBishop of Grasse, France
7 Dec 169259.9Ordained BishopBishop of Grasse, France
17 Dec 171078.0DiedBishop of Grasse, France

MicroData Summary for François Verjus:
Bishop François Verjus (died ) Bishop of Grasse

  • a bishop for 18.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 212

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013