Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-François de Macheco de Prémeaux

Deceased

Bishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1687BornDijon
1711¹23.9Ordained PriestPriest
29 Mar 172639.1SelectedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France
9 Dec 172639.8ConfirmedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France
12 Jan 172739.9Ordained BishopBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France
29 Apr 175265.2DiedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-François de Macheco de Prémeaux:
Bishop Jean-François de Macheco de Prémeaux (born , died ) Bishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans)

  • a priest for 41.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 169
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015