Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Ragazzoni

Deceased

Bishop of Bergamo, Italy

Titular Bishop of Nazianzus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1536¹Born
15 Jan 156125.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Famagusta, Cyprus
15 Jan 156125.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Nazianzus
10 Dec 157236.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kisamos (Cisamo), Greece
19 Sep 157640.7AppointedBishop of Novara, Italy
19 Jul 157741.5AppointedBishop of Bergamo, Italy
28 Sep 158347.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
14 Jun 158650.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
5 Mar 159256.1DiedBishop of Bergamo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Ragazzoni (VIAF: 57490569)
Bishop Girolamo Ragazzoni (born 1536, died ) Bishop of Bergamo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia

Source(s):
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 113
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 261, and Page 194
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 166, and Page 254
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 281
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1561, Number 3*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 28 May 2018

Quantcast