Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Pierre de Castellane

Deceased

Bishop of Fréjus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1661¹BornProvence
2 Jun 170847.4Ordained PriestPriest
12 Apr 171554.2SelectedBishop of Fréjus, France
29 May 171554.4ConfirmedBishop of Fréjus, France
30 Jun 171554.4Ordained BishopBishop of Fréjus, France
21 Mar 173978.2DiedBishop of Fréjus, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Pierre de Castellane:
Bishop Joseph-Pierre de Castellane (born 1661, died ) Bishop of Fréjus

  • a priest for 30.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 204
  • ob/c2+: CB, 26 May 2015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1715, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 27 Jul 2015