Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benjamin de L’Isle du Gast

Deceased

Bishop of Limoges, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1675Born
6 Jun 170529.9Ordained PriestPriest
27 Dec 172954.5SelectedBishop of Limoges, France
14 Aug 173055.1ConfirmedBishop of Limoges, France
21 Sep 173055.2Ordained BishopBishop of Limoges, France
5 Sep 173964.1DiedBishop of Limoges, France

MicroData Summary for Benjamin de L’Isle du Gast
Bishop Benjamin de L’Isle du Gast (born , died ) Bishop of Limoges

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIsle du Gast

  • a priest for 34.2 years
  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 24
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 257

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast