Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Adhémar de Monteil de Grignan

Deceased

Bishop of Uzés


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1615¹BornGrignan
31 Aug 164328.6SelectedBishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France
20 Mar 164530.2ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France
14 May 164530.3Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France
22 May 165742.3SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Uzés, France
30 Sep 165843.7ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Uzés, France
12 Feb 166045.1SucceededBishop of Uzés, France
13 Sep 167459.6DiedBishop of Uzés, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacques Adhémar de Monteil de Grignan:
Bishop Jacques Adhémar de Monteil de Grignan (died ) Bishop of Uzés

  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 354, and Page 344
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 11 Apr 2015