Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri Vielle, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Rabat

Titular Bishop of Halmiros


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1867BornLéguevin, France
28 May 189124.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
8 Jun 192760.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Rabat, Morocco
20 Jun 192760.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Halmiros
25 Jul 192760.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Halmiros
7 May 194678.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Rabat, Morocco

MicroData Summary for Henri Vielle:
Bishop Henri Vielle O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Rabat

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013