Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Yvon-Joseph Moreau, O.C.S.O.

Bishop Emeritus of Sainte-Anne-de-la-Pocatière, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1941 Born
18 Jun 196826.6Ordained PriestPriest of Sainte-Anne-de-la-Pocatière, Québec, Canada
22 Oct 199048.9ProfessedPriest of Order of Cistercians of the Strict Observance
18 Oct 200866.9AppointedBishop of Sainte-Anne-de-la-Pocatière, Québec, Canada
27 Dec 200867.1Ordained BishopBishop of Sainte-Anne-de-la-Pocatière, Québec, Canada
8 Dec 201776.1RetiredBishop of Sainte-Anne-de-la-Pocatière, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Yvon-Joseph Moreau (VIAF: 17507464)
Bishop Yvon-Joseph Moreau O.C.S.O. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Sainte-Anne-de-la-Pocatière

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Pascal-de-Kamouraska
Ordained BishopSainte-Anne, Cathedral, La Pocatière, Diocese of Sainte-Anne-de-la-Pocatière, Québec

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sainte-Anne-de-la-Pocatière.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Oct 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 16,001
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast