Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Dennis Corriveau, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop Emeritus of Nelson, British Columbia, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1941 Born
14 Jul 196321.9Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
23 Oct 196524.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
20 Jun 199452.8ElectedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
3 Jul 200058.9ElectedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
4 Sep 200665.1CeasedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
30 Nov 200766.3AppointedBishop of Nelson, British Columbia, Canada
30 Jan 200866.5Ordained BishopBishop of Nelson, British Columbia, Canada
13 Feb 201876.5RetiredBishop of Nelson, British Columbia, Canada

MicroData Summary for John Dennis Corriveau (VIAF: 166422056)
Bishop John Dennis Corriveau O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Nelson

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZurich, Ontario
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Church, Kelowna, Diocese of Nelson, British Columbia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nelson.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,668
  • mige: AJ, 17 Nov 2015
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast