Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Infanti della Mora, O.S.M.

Vicar Apostolic of Aysén

Titular Bishop of Cartennae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1954 BornCampomolle di Teor
5 Aug 199036.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
30 Aug 199945.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Aysén, Chile
30 Aug 199945.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cartennae
5 Dec 199945.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cartennae

MicroData Summary for Luigi Infanti della Mora:
Bishop Luigi Infanti della Mora O.S.M. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Aysén

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Aysén.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,650

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013