Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul-Siméon Ahouanan Djro, O.F.M.

Archbishop of Bouaké, Côte d’Ivoire


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1952 Born
19 Jul 198128.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
6 Dec 199542.9AppointedBishop of Yamoussoukro, Côte d’Ivoire
16 Mar 199643.2Ordained BishopBishop of Yamoussoukro, Côte d’Ivoire
12 Jan 200653.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Bouaké, Côte d’Ivoire
22 Sep 200653.7SucceededArchbishop of Bouaké, Côte d’Ivoire

MicroData Summary for Paul-Siméon Ahouanan Djro
(WikiData: Q1272260)
Archbishop Paul-Siméon Ahouanan Djro O.F.M. (born ) Archbishop of Bouaké

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBingerville

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bouaké.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,739
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 22 May 2023