Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gérard Pettipas, C.SS.R.

Archbishop of Grouard-McLennan, Alberta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1950 BornHalifax
15 Aug 197322.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
7 May 197726.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
30 Nov 200656.2AppointedArchbishop of Grouard-McLennan, Alberta, Canada
25 Jan 200756.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Grouard-McLennan, Alberta, Canada

MicroData Summary for Gérard Pettipas:
Archbishop Gérard Pettipas C.SS.R. (born ) Archbishop of Grouard-McLennan

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Grouard-McLennan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,323

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 8 Jan 2014