Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Félix Kouadjo

Deceased

Bishop of Bondoukou


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1939BornBinao
16 Mar 196930.2Ordained PriestPriest
22 Apr 199657.3AppointedBishop of Bondoukou, Côte d’Ivoire
20 Jul 199657.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bondoukou, Côte d’Ivoire
6 May 201273.3DiedBishop of Bondoukou, Côte d’Ivoire

MicroData Summary for Félix Kouadjo:
Bishop Félix Kouadjo (born 1939, died ) Bishop of Bondoukou

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,838
  • d: CB, 7 May 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015