Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert Privet Thévenot, M. Afr.

Bishop Emeritus of Prince-Albert, Saskatchewan, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1945 Born
7 Aug 197529.7ProfessedMember of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
2 Aug 198034.7Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
26 May 200862.5AppointedBishop of Prince-Albert, Saskatchewan, Canada
6 Aug 200862.7Ordained BishopBishop of Prince-Albert, Saskatchewan, Canada
25 Mar 202175.3RetiredBishop of Prince-Albert, Saskatchewan, Canada

MicroData Summary for Albert Privet Thévenot
Bishop Albert Privet Thévenot M. Afr. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Prince-Albert

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTreherne
Ordained BishopSacré-Coeur, Cathedral, Prince-Albert, Diocese of Prince-Albert, Saskatchewan

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Prince-Albert.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 May 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,941
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 25 Mar 2021

Quantcast