Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Bui Chu Tao

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pht Diệm, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1909Born
13 Mar 193728.1Ordained PriestPriest of Pht Dim, Viet Nam
30 Nov 195647.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Pht Dim, Viet Nam
24 Jan 195950.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Pht Dim, Viet Nam
24 Jan 195950.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Numida
26 Apr 195950.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Numida
24 Nov 196051.8AppointedBishop of Pht Diệm, Viet Nam
3 Nov 199889.7RetiredBishop of Pht Diệm, Viet Nam
5 May 200192.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Pht Diệm, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Paul Bui Chu Tao
Bishop Paul Bui Chu Tao (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pht Diệm

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTam Chu, Kim Nhac

  • a priest for 64.1 years
  • a bishop for 42.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • c1: CB, 27 Apr 2011
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations piscopales, Issue 1959, Number 37
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast