Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albini LeBlanc

Deceased

Bishop of Gaspé, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1894Born
15 May 192127.0Ordained PriestPriest of Moncton, New Brunswick, Canada
14 Dec 194046.6AppointedBishop of Hearst, Ontario, Canada
11 Feb 194146.7Ordained BishopBishop of Hearst, Ontario, Canada
24 Mar 194146.8InstalledBishop of Hearst, Ontario, Canada
22 Dec 194551.6AppointedBishop of Gaspé, Québec, Canada
17 May 195763.0DiedBishop of Gaspé, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Albini LeBlanc
Bishop Albini LeBlanc (born , died ) Bishop of Gaspé

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBouctouche, Archdiocese of Moncton, New Brunswick
Ordained PriestCathedral, St. John, Diocese of Saint John in New Brunswick, New Brunswick
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame de l`Assomption, Cathedral, Moncton, Archdiocese of Moncton, New Brunswick
Death PlaceSainte Majorique, Diocese of Gaspé, Québec
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Gaspé, Diocese of Gaspé, Québec

  • a priest for 36.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 4
  • c12/loc: CB, 14 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 15 Apr 2019

Quantcast