Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Costanzo Micci

Deceased

Bishop of Fano, Italy

Bishop of Cagli e Pergola

Bishop of Fossombrone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1918Born
22 Feb 194122.7Ordained PriestPriest of Fano, Italy
21 Apr 195940.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Larino, Italy
21 Apr 195940.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Hadriania
7 Jun 195941.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hadriania
11 Nov 196042.4AppointedBishop of Larino, Italy
15 Aug 196648.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Fano, Italy
15 Aug 196648.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Maiuca
1 Jun 197355.0AppointedBishop of Fano, Italy
1 Jun 197355.0AppointedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
15 Jan 197758.6AppointedBishop of Cagli e Pergola, Italy
4 Sep 198567.2DiedBishop of Fano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Costanzo Micci
Bishop Costanzo Micci (born , died ) Bishop of Fano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Michele de Fiume

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 50
  • ab/auxb/l229: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1960, Page 545

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast