Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Kihara Kariuki, I.M.C.

Bishop of Marsabit, Kenya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1954 Born
16 Dec 198329.8Ordained PriestPriest of Consolata Missionaries
3 Jun 199945.3AppointedBishop of Muranga, Kenya
11 Sep 199945.5Ordained BishopBishop of Muranga, Kenya
25 Nov 200652.8AppointedBishop of Marsabit, Kenya
25 Jan 200752.9InstalledBishop of Marsabit, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Peter Kihara Kariuki
Bishop Peter Kihara Kariuki I.M.C. (born ) Bishop of Marsabit

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThunguri

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Marsabit.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Nov 2006
  • i: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,607

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast