Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salesius Mugambi

Bishop of Meru, Kenya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1951 Born
10 Dec 197726.9Ordained PriestPriest of Meru, Kenya
1 Dec 200150.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Meru, Kenya
19 Mar 200251.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Meru, Kenya
18 Mar 200453.2SucceededBishop of Meru, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Salesius Mugambi
Bishop Salesius Mugambi (born 1951) Bishop of Meru

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEgandene

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Meru.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,151

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 9 Oct 2022