Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cornelius Schilder, M.H.M.

Bishop Emeritus of Ngong, Kenya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1941 Born
29 Jun 196826.7Ordained PriestPriest of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
23 Nov 200261.1AppointedBishop of Ngong, Kenya
25 Jan 200361.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ngong, Kenya
1 Aug 200967.8ResignedBishop of Ngong, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Cornelius Schilder
Bishop Cornelius Schilder M.H.M. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ngong

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWestwoud, Netherlands

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ngong.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Aug 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,322

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast