Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leonardo Mario Bernacchi, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Camiri

Titular Bishop of Tabaicara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1933BornChiusi della Verna
29 Jun 195825.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
17 Nov 199360.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Cuevo, Bolivia
17 Nov 199360.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tabaicara
20 Mar 199461.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tabaicara
29 Mar 200370.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Camiri, Bolivia
15 Jul 200976.5RetiredVicar Apostolic of Camiri, Bolivia
10 Apr 201279.3DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Camiri, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Leonardo Mario Bernacchi:
Bishop Leonardo Mario Bernacchi O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Camiri

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Number 12,305
  • d: CB, 12 Apr 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013