Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel Okombo Wandera

Bishop Emeritus of Kericho, Kenya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1942 Born
30 Nov 197230.0Ordained PriestPriest of Kisumu, Kenya
27 Apr 198744.4IncardinatedPriest of Bungoma, Kenya
22 Mar 200360.3AppointedBishop of Kericho, Kenya
24 May 200360.4Ordained BishopBishop of Kericho, Kenya
14 Dec 201977.0RetiredBishop of Kericho, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Okombo Wandera
Bishop Emmanuel Okombo Wandera (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Kericho

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBungoma
Ordained BishopGrounds of, Teachers Training College, Kericho, Diocese of Kericho

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kericho.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,399
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast