Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Omar de Jesús Mejía Giraldo

Archbishop of Florencia, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1966 Born
16 Nov 199125.8Ordained PriestPriest of Sonsón-Rionegro, Colombia
27 Apr 201347.2AppointedBishop of Florencia, Colombia
29 Jun 201347.4Ordained BishopBishop of Florencia, Colombia
13 Jul 201953.4AppointedArchbishop of Florencia, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Omar de Jesús Mejía Giraldo
Archbishop Omar de Jesús Mejía Giraldo (born ) Archbishop of Florencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEl Santuario, Diocese of Sonsón
Ordained BishopSan Judas Tadeo, Church, El Santuario, Diocese of Sonsón-Rionegro

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Florencia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Apr 2013
  • ob/c23: CB, 15 Jun 2013
  • c4: CB, 18 Jun 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,806
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast