Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Óscar Augusto Múnera Ochoa

Vicar Apostolic of Tierradentro

Titular Bishop of Corniculana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1962 BornSan Pedro de los Milagros
22 Nov 198826.4Ordained PriestPriest of Santa Rosa de Osos, Colombia
5 Jun 201553.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tierradentro, Colombia
5 Jun 201553.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Corniculana
10 Jul 201553.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corniculana
19 Jul 201553.1InstalledVicar Apostolic of Tierradentro, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Óscar Augusto Múnera Ochoa:
Bishop Óscar Augusto Múnera Ochoa (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Tierradentro

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Tierradentro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Jun 2015
  • ob/i: CB, 5 Jun 2015
  • c1: CB, 7 Jun 2015
  • c2+: CB, 9 Jul 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,542

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015