Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Tato

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago del Estero, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1907Born
21 Dec 192922.7Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
13 Nov 194841.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
13 Nov 194841.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Aulon
27 Mar 194942.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aulon
11 Jul 196154.3AppointedBishop of Santiago del Estero, Argentina
8 Dec 196154.7InstalledBishop of Santiago del Estero, Argentina
12 Aug 198073.4DiedBishop of Santiago del Estero, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Manuel Tato
Bishop Manuel Tato (born , died ) Bishop of Santiago del Estero

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast