Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Carlos Carreras

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Justo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1906BornSan Miguel de Tucumán
17 Dec 193933.6Ordained PriestPriest
7 Apr 196255.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
7 Apr 196255.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Campania
29 Apr 196256.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Campania
12 Jun 196559.1AppointedBishop of San Rafael, Argentina
1 Aug 196559.3InstalledBishop of San Rafael, Argentina
19 Jul 196963.2AppointedBishop of San Justo, Argentina
26 Oct 196963.5InstalledBishop of San Justo, Argentina
14 Apr 198276.0RetiredBishop of San Justo, Argentina
18 Feb 198780.8DiedBishop Emeritus of San Justo, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Jorge Carlos Carreras:
Bishop Jorge Carlos Carreras (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Justo

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013