Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Devoto

Deceased

Bishop of Goya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1918BornBuenos Aires
6 Dec 194224.6Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
12 Jun 196143.1AppointedBishop of Goya, Argentina
17 Sep 196143.3Ordained BishopBishop of Goya, Argentina
29 Oct 196143.4InstalledBishop of Goya, Argentina
29 Jul 198466.2DiedBishop of Goya, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Alberto Devoto:
Bishop Alberto Devoto (born , died ) Bishop of Goya

  • a priest for 41.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 12,981

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013