Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Federico León Aneiros (Aneyros)

Deceased

Archbishop of Buenos Aires


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1826BornBuenos Aires
12 Jul 184822.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
7 Oct 184822.3Ordained PriestPriest
21 Mar 187043.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
21 Mar 187043.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Aulon
23 Oct 187044.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aulon
Feb 1873³46.6SelectedArchbishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
25 Jul 187347.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
3 Sep 189468.2DiedArchbishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Federico León Aneiros (Aneyros):
Archbishop Federico León Aneiros (Aneyros) (born , died ) Archbishop of Buenos Aires

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 132, and Page 567
  • ob/obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013