Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Menéndez

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Martín


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1915BornBuenos Aires
17 Dec 193924.8Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
25 Oct 195641.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
25 Oct 195641.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Diospolis Superior
16 Dec 195641.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Diospolis Superior
12 Jun 196146.3AppointedBishop of San Martín, Argentina
1 Oct 196146.6InstalledBishop of San Martín, Argentina
16 Jul 199176.4RetiredBishop of San Martín, Argentina
15 Dec 199984.8DiedBishop Emeritus of San Martín, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Manuel Menéndez:
Bishop Manuel Menéndez (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Martín

  • a priest for 59.9 years
  • a bishop for 42.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 111
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015