Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Justo Oscar Laguna

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Morón


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1929BornBuenos Aires
18 Sep 195424.9Ordained PriestPriest
1 Feb 197545.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Isidro, Argentina
1 Feb 197545.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Lares
8 Mar 197545.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lares
22 Jan 198050.3AppointedBishop of Morón, Argentina
22 Mar 198050.4InstalledBishop of Morón, Argentina
30 Nov 200475.1RetiredBishop of Morón, Argentina
3 Nov 201182.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Morón, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Justo Oscar Laguna:
Bishop Justo Oscar Laguna (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Morón

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 3 Nov 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 12,982
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015