Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mariano Medrano y Cabrera

Deceased

Bishop of Buenos Aires


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1767BornBuenos Aires
17 Dec 179124.2Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
7 Oct 182962.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Buenos Aires, Argentina
7 Oct 182962.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Aulon
26 Sep 183063.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aulon
2 Jul 183264.8AppointedBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
26 Mar 183466.5InstalledBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
7 Apr 185183.5DiedBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Mariano Medrano y Cabrera (VIAF: 307466185)
Bishop Mariano Medrano y Cabrera (born , died ) Bishop of Buenos Aires

  • a priest for 59.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 96, and Page 378
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,712
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1830, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 24 Jul 2016