Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Rocca

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Buenos Aires, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Augusta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1888Born
28 Oct 191123.6Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
27 Jun 193648.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
27 Jun 193648.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Augusta
30 Aug 193648.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Augusta
22 Apr 197587.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
12 May 197991.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Buenos Aires, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Antonio Rocca
Bishop Antonio Rocca (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Buenos Aires

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires

  • a priest for 67.5 years
  • a bishop for 42.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 3 Oct 2018

Quantcast