Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvador Flores Huerta

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Lázaro Cárdenas, Michoacán, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1934Born
1 Mar 195824.0Ordained PriestPriest
3 May 199359.2AppointedBishop of Ciudad Lázaro Cárdenas, Michoacán, México
24 Jun 199359.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Lázaro Cárdenas, Michoacán, México
30 Sep 200672.6ResignedBishop of Ciudad Lázaro Cárdenas, Michoacán, México
14 Dec 201884.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Ciudad Lázaro Cárdenas, Michoacán, México

MicroData Summary for Salvador Flores Huerta
Bishop Salvador Flores Huerta (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Lázaro Cárdenas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCoeneo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ciudad Lázaro Cárdenas, Diocese of Ciudad Lázaro Cárdenas, Michoacán
Death PlaceArio de Rosales

  • a priest for 60.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Sep 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,114
  • d: CB, 15 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 17 Dec 2018

Quantcast