Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Gabriel Cuara Méndez

Deceased

Bishop of Veracruz, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1939Born
2 Dec 196223.7Ordained PriestPriest
6 Aug 198950.4AppointedBishop of Tuxpan, Veracruz, México
25 Oct 198950.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tuxpan, Veracruz, México
18 Feb 200060.9AppointedBishop of Veracruz, México
20 Nov 200566.7DiedBishop of Veracruz, México

MicroData Summary for Luis Gabriel Cuara Méndez
Bishop Luis Gabriel Cuara Méndez (born , died ) Bishop of Veracruz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Juan Parangaricutiro

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,183
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast