Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvador Cleofás Murguía Villalobos, S.D.B.

Prelate of Mixes, Oaxaca, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1953 Born
1974²20.2First VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
28 Sep 198027.0Perpetual VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
11 Dec 198229.2Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
13 Jun 201864.7AppointedPrelate of Mixes, Oaxaca, México
2 Aug 201864.8Ordained BishopPrelate of Mixes, Oaxaca, México

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Salvador Cleofás Murguía Villalobos
Bishop Salvador Cleofás Murguía Villalobos S.D.B. (born ) Prelate of Mixes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeón
Ordained BishopAuditorio Municipal de San Pedro y San Pablo Ayutla, Mixes, Territorial Prelature of Mixes, Oaxaca

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Mixes.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Jun 2018
  • ln: CB, 13 Jun 2018
  • ob: CB, 7 Jul 2018
  • c2+: CB, 30 Jul 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 237, Number 19,830

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast