Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Luis Castro Medellín, M. S. F.

Bishop Emeritus of Tacámbaro, Michoacán, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1938 Born
10 Jan 196021.5Perpetual VowsMember
16 Jun 196324.9Ordained PriestPriest
25 Oct 200264.3AppointedBishop of Tacámbaro, Michoacán, México
3 Dec 200264.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tacámbaro, Michoacán, México
22 Aug 201476.1RetiredBishop of Tacámbaro, Michoacán, México

MicroData Summary for José Luis Castro Medellín
Bishop José Luis Castro Medellín M. S. F. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Tacámbaro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMineral de La Noria

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tacámbaro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • MSF: CB, 9 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,286
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Aug 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018