Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert William Marshall

Bishop of Alexandria, Louisiana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1959 Born
10 Jun 200040.9Ordained PriestPriest of Memphis, Tennessee, USA
21 Apr 202060.8AppointedBishop of Alexandria, Louisiana, USA
20 Aug 202061.1Ordained BishopBishop of Alexandria, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert William Marshall
Bishop Robert William Marshall (born ) Bishop of Alexandria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMemphis, Diocese of Memphis, Tennessee
Ordained PriestImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Memphis, Diocese of Memphis, Tennessee
Ordained BishopSt. Francis Xavier, Cathedral, Alexandria, Diocese of Alexandria, Louisiana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Alexandria.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Apr 2020
  • mn/c1: CB, 21 Apr 2020
  • ob: CB, 11 Jun 2020
  • c2+: CB, 28 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 21 Aug 2020

Quantcast