Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Chang Pi-te

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Zhaoxian [Chaohsien]

Titular Bishop of Panemotichus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1893BornSiaoying
22 Dec 191724.9Ordained PriestPriest
9 Apr 192936.2AppointedPrefect of Chaohsien [Zhaoxian], China
11 Jan 193239.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Antipyrgos
11 Jan 193239.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Chaohsien [Zhaoxian], China
24 Apr 193239.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antipyrgos
11 Apr 194653.2AppointedBishop of Zhaoxian [Chaohsien], China
13 Feb 195360.1ResignedBishop of Zhaoxian [Chaohsien], China
13 Feb 195360.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Panemotichus
1976¹83.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Zhaoxian [Chaohsien], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Chang Pi-te:
Bishop John Chang Pi-te (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Zhaoxian [Chaohsien]

  • a priest for 58.0 years
  • a bishop for 43.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013