Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Marvéz

Deceased

Bishop of Zulia, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1839Born
19 Dec 186324.1Ordained PriestPriest
25 Oct 189757.9AppointedBishop of Zulia, Venezuela
16 Jan 189858.1Ordained BishopBishop of Zulia, Venezuela
17 Dec 190465.1DiedBishop of Zulia, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Francisco Marvéz
Bishop Francisco Marvéz (born , died ) Bishop of Zulia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValencia, Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
Ordained BishopCathedral, Caracas, Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2+: CB
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 603
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Jun 2017