Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Charles Barber, S.J.

Bishop of Oakland, California


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1954 BornSalt Lake City, UT
8 Jun 198530.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
3 May 201358.8AppointedBishop of Oakland, California, USA
25 May 201358.9Ordained BishopBishop of Oakland, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael Charles Barber:
Bishop Michael Charles Barber S.J. (born ) Bishop of Oakland

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Oakland.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 May 2013
  • ob/c2+: CB, 3 May 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,795

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 7 May 2014